THE TELEVISION WORKSHOP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Television Workshop promotes, enhances, develops and maintains the education of young people, including those from disadvantaged backgrounds, in relation to performing arts and media. The objects are achieved by the provision of workshops in film and television, theatre and drama skills and the preparation and the presentation of theatre performances by children and young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
- Salford City
Governance
- 06 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FELICITY MARY MILTON | Chair | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karl Myers | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Steven Ryde | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tara Alexis Gayle | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolina Giammetta | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Helen Moore | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Jane Jaggers | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUE NOTT | Trustee | 05 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIAN KEMP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN WATTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £394.43k | £340.23k | £539.70k | £466.44k | £370.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £386.84k | £321.11k | £495.17k | £456.33k | £337.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.33k | £8.34k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £13.15k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £390.33k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £100.65k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £9 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £35.57k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £149.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £346.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENHANCE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING THOSE FROM DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUNDS, IN RELATION TO THE PERFORMING ARTS AND MEDIA IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS, BY BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS IN FILM AND TELEVISION, THEATRE AND DRAMA SKILLS; AND THE PREPARATION AND THE PRESENTATION OF THEATRE PERFORMANCES BY CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 2
9 Cranbrook Street
Nottingham
NG1 1ER
- Phone:
- 07342 326427
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window