HERNE BAY PIER TRUST

Charity Number: 1128253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The preservation, renovation, reconstruction and enhancement of Herne Bay Pier as a building of special architectural and historic interest. The promotion and use of the pier for recreational purposes and a community and heritage building for the use and benefit of all inhabitants and visitors to Herne Bay.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £173,848
Total expenditure: £108,562

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 2009: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Linda Blake Chair 20 August 2019
None on record
Michael Paul Scott Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Michael Paul Tucker Trustee 11 February 2024
None on record
Clive Forsyth Austin Trustee 10 June 2022
None on record
Susan Pearl Halfpenny Trustee 06 November 2019
None on record
David Townsend Trustee 24 February 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £152.20k £172.09k £140.60k £200.51k £173.85k
Total expenditure £148.98k £177.24k £134.56k £133.47k £108.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £42.49k £73.32k £10.79k £450 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 20 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 07 October 2021 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 07 October 2021 37 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Herne Bay Pier Trust
The White House
Central Parade
HERNE BAY
CT6 5JN
Phone:
07736783436