Financial history EMSWORTH BAPTIST CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 1126260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £109.33k £66.95k £87.10k £103.76k £115.34k
Total expenditure £15.34k £44.01k £42.34k £56.69k £105.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A