POLYTECHNIC FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation and provision of facilities for community participation in the healthy recreation of playing football.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hounslow
Governance
- 11 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARRY JOHN MADIGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLIN MONGUL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER WILLIAM BAMFORTH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.79k | £53.46k | £73.53k | £73.56k | £77.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.69k | £17.64k | £90.96k | £77.68k | £67.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 25 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 10 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1) TO ORGANISE OR PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION OR PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN THE HEALTHY RECREATION OF PLAYING FOOTBALL; 2) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. UN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
QUINTIN HOGG MEMORIAL SPORTSGROUND
CAVENDISH ROSD
LONDON
W4 3UH
- Phone:
- 02088765275
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window