Financial history THE SHEKINER GLORY FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1127460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £20.00k £9.50k £900 £0 £0
Total expenditure £17.00k £9.50k £900 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A