THE SHEKINER GLORY FOUNDATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We reduce isolation of BME Communities in Dudley by providing a platform for through workshops, networking, forums, focus groups , social gatherings to improve their well being or quality of life
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Botswana
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 09 January 2009: Standard registration
- LORAC FOUNDATION TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLINE NYAKUDYA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH DZAPASI | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.00k | £9.50k | £900 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.00k | £9.50k | £900 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 21 March 2022 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 04 March 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
1) ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2) RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP. 3) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM THE HIV/AIDS VIRUS. 4) APPLICATION OF CAPITAL; AT THEIR DISCRETION THE TRUSTEES MAY SPEND ALL OR PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Parsons Street
DUDLEY
West Midlands
DY1 1JJ
- Phone:
- 01384 910963
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window