INNER FLAME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empowering young people who are at a disadvantage, so they have a greater opportunity to thrive. We do this through challenging training programmes, facilitated mental wellbeing workshopws, and 1-1 mentoring. Building confidence, self esteem, and a sense of purpose, focusing particularly on programmes to help jobseekers aged 16-25.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £49,575 from 2 government contract(s) and £29,833 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 January 2009: Standard registration
- 10 July 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 10 July 2024: Funds transferred to 1107900 SWINDON MENTORING AND SELF HELP YOUTH PROJECT
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.42k | £167.56k | £98.22k | £241.54k | £189.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.23k | £142.10k | £101.40k | £154.13k | £215.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £60.25k | £41.54k | £91.28k | £49.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £18.15k | £36.04k | £29.83k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 July 2022 | 14 days late | |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 19 LIVING IN GREAT BRITAIN, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window