Accounts and annual returns THE INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF RADICALISATION AND POLITICAL VIOLENCE

Charity number: 1135014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 14 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 14 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 03 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 03 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 09 October 2020 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 09 October 2020 101 days late Download Open in new window