THE INTERNATIONAL CENTRE FOR THE STUDY OF RADICALISATION AND POLITICAL VIOLENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PUBLICATION OF RESEARCH, ANALYSIS AND EDUCATION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 March 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Marc William Fleischman | Chair | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lord James Nicholas Bethell | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Sacher | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sir Lawrence Freedman | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
KIM CAMPBELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.46k | £56.33k | £18.20k | £46.80k | £47.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.67k | £49.54k | £14.17k | £50.67k | £28.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2020 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE IN RELATION TO DIPLOMACY AND STRATEGY, PUBLIC ADMINISTRATION AND POLICY, SECURITY AND COUNTER-TERRORISM AND INTERNATIONAL CONFLICT RESOLUTION. 2 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ICSR
DEPARTMENT OF WAR STUDIES
KINGS'C COLLEGE LONDON
STRAND
WC2R 2LS
- Phone:
- 02078482098
- Email:
- mail@icsr.info
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window