DIVINE CHRISTIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1126492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

EDUCATION AND PROMOTION OF CHRISTIAN VALUES AND PREACHING THE GOSPEL

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £76,871
Total expenditure: £81,854

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Greenwich
  • Lewisham
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PASTOR EUGENE OKONKWO Chair
None on record
Pauline Williams Trustee 23 May 2020
None on record
Tejan Nnadi Trustee 23 May 2020
None on record
JOY OKONKWO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £30.21k £32.12k £55.28k £75.67k £76.87k
Total expenditure £28.47k £51.89k £54.89k £77.96k £81.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 20 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 20 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 17 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 17 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 24 July 2023 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 24 July 2023 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 June 2022 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 09 June 2022 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 05 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 05 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1ST FLOOR
CAPITAL HOUSE
47 RUSHEY GREEN
LONDON
Phone:
07908334348
Website:

No information available