DIVERSABILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide funds & logistical support for individuals aiming to create more positive perceptions of people with disabilities. We also instigate perception-changing campaigns that crystallise & strengthen the meaning of diversability & support products & services that directly create a more accurate, less stereotypical portrayal of disabled people, and enable them to live more fulfilling lives.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 November 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL AND MENTAL DISABILITIES PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING GRANTS AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR PEOPLE WITH DISABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL; B) PROVIDING SPONSORSHIP AND GRANTS TO SMALL EMPLOYERS TO HELP THEM TO ACCOMMODATE DISABLED INDIVIDUALS IN THE WORK PLACE; C) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE DIVERSITY OF DISABILITIES AND OTHER RELATED ISSUES." TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY [FOR EXAMPLE]: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF DISABILITY; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY."
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window