Accounts and annual returns THE RED BALLOON LEARNER CENTRE MERSEYSIDE

Charity number: 1126548
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2013 10 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2013 10 April 2014 On Time
Annual return 30 August 2012 04 March 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2012 04 March 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2011 20 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 20 January 2012 On Time
Annual return 30 August 2010 18 April 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2010 18 April 2011 On Time