THE RED BALLOON LEARNER CENTRE MERSEYSIDE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating a small school in Merseyside to recover severly bullied children aged 10 to 17 who have excluded themselves from school because of fear. We provide them with counselling and education with the objective of helping them return to mainstream education or employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 03 November 2008: Standard registration
- 15 May 2014: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE RED BALLOON LEARNER CENTRE LIVERPOOL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2009 | 30/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 30/08/2012 | 30/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.44k | £71.11k | £121.73k | £105.49k | £89.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £462 | £91.28k | £189.44k | £127.35k | £119.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2013 | 10 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2013 | 10 April 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 August 2012 | 04 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2012 | 04 March 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 20 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | 20 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 August 2010 | 18 April 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2010 | 18 April 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AGED 9 TO 18 AT THE RED BALLOON LEARNING CENTRE, BEING STUDENTS WHO ARE VICTIMS OF SEVERE BULLYING AND FOR THE TIME BEING ARE UNABLE TO ATTEND MAINSTREAM SCHOOL BY PROVIDING TUITION AND APPROPRIATE SUPPORT FOR THEM IN A SAFE LEARNING ENVIRONMENT UNTIL THEY ARE READY TO RETURN TO MAINSTREAM EDUCATION FOR EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE MERSEYSIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window