AIRBORNE ASSAULT LIMITED

Charity Number: 1126776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The education of the public and service personnel about the history, deeds, traditions and the role of the Parachute Regiment and Airborne Forces from 1940 to the present day. It does this through a state of the art interactive display located at IWM Duxford and an online digital archive - ParaData.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £135,913
Total expenditure: £200,064

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 December 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • AAL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MATTHEW PETER LOWE MBE Chair 01 January 2021
THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT AND AIRBORNE FORCES CHARITY
Received: On time
ST CATHERINE'S SCHOOL BRAMLEY
Received: On time
Col Robert Arter Trustee 11 July 2024
None on record
Giles Rackley Orpen-Smellie Trustee 26 October 2023
None on record
Scott Evans Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Mark Pitt Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record
Colonel Andrew Wright Trustee 04 February 2021
None on record
COLONEL GRAHAM LIVINGSTONE Trustee 04 February 2021
None on record
Colonel Martyn Russell Wills Trustee 04 February 2021
None on record
Richard Moore Trustee 03 April 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £166.82k £119.59k £131.91k £137.37k £135.91k
Total expenditure £212.38k £179.82k £180.82k £183.50k £200.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CHARITY COMMISSION SCHEME SEALED 18 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO FURTHER THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT - A. THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND SERVICE PERSONNEL ABOUT THE HISTORY DEEDS TRADITIONS AND THE ROLE OF THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT AND AIRBORNE FORCES. B. THE PROMOTION OF MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY ASSISTING RECRUITMENT AND RETENTION AND FOSTERING THE ESPRIT DE CORPS OF THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT AND AIRBORNE FORCES. C. THE COMMEMORATION AND REMEMBRANCE OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PARACHUTE REGIMENT AND AIRBORNE FORCES WHO HAVE DIED WHILE IN SERVICE; AND THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF PUBLIC RECOGNITION OF THE SACRIFICE MADE BY SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 02 December 2008 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
AIRBORNE ASSAULT LTD
DUXFORD AIRFIELD
DUXFORD
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 4QR
Phone:
01223839909