KARADI SANGATHAN MANDAL (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities concentrate mainly on providing education and social needs for the people of Karadi, which is village in India in the state of Gujarat. Various fund raising events are carried out to raise funds and then utilised for various projects in the village that help to improve the lives of the people there and in the surrounding villages. Education projects are given priority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 03 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tejas Devabhai Patel | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Duxa Patel | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prashant Devabhai Patel | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roshaniben Chhimabhai Patel | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bhartiben Chandrakant Karadia | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
ASHOK RANCHHODBHAI PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.02k | £3.36k | £3.40k | £9.23k | £2.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.81k | £2.68k | £709 | £10.40k | £716 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 June 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 JUNE 2007 AMENDED 2 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN KARADI, INDIA AND THE UK. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN KARADI, INDIA AND THE UK IN HINDUISM AND THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF HINDU CULTURE. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POVERTY AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE IN KARADI, INDIA AND THE UK. TO ADVANCE THE HINDU RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE FOLLOWING DOCTRINES; FRIENDSHIP, BROTHERLY LOVE AND DEVOTION ASSISTANCE AND SELFLESSNESS IN TIME OF NEED OF OTHERS, WISDOM , RIGHTEOUSNESS, TRUTH AND FREEDOM. FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DREAMING.
Area of benefit
KARADUI INDIA AND THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 BARRINGTON ROAD
LEICESTER
LE2 2RA
- Phone:
- 07545115829
- Email:
- ria@ashok.u-net.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window