NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES UK LIMITED

Charity number: 1127128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education of the public in relation to scientific matters, in particular by supporting the New York Academy of Sciences in such ways and in such manner as shall be exclusively Charitable and such other exclusively charitable purposes as the Trustees of the Charity may in their absolute discretion determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023

Total income: £7,710
Total expenditure: £12,187

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 December 2008: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nicholas Dirks Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Giancarlo Bonagura Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Jerry Hultin Trustee 30 June 2020
None on record
Thomas Pompidou Trustee 26 April 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023
Total gross income £6.00k £4.32k £5.11k £5.71k £7.71k
Total expenditure £4.91k £5.76k £5.34k £7.48k £12.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 01 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 04 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 WORLD TRADE CENTER
250 GREENWICH STREET
NEW YORK, NY
Phone:
2122988600
Website:

No information available