MIGHTY MEN OF VALOUR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance in life and relieve needs of young people, through providing support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals. GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES EDUCATION/TRAINING THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £496,187 from 2 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anton Richards | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Benjamin | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £437.28k | £386.17k | £347.36k | £292.48k | £496.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £388.02k | £386.72k | £334.42k | £310.03k | £443.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £382.10k | £386.17k | £347.36k | £292.48k | £496.19k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 01 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 17 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 22 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF MEN, IN PARTICULAR MEN OF ETHNIC MINORITY BACKGROUND ('THE BENEFICIAL CLASS') WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE NEED AND UNEMPLOYMENT AMONGST THE BENEFICIAL CLASS AND WOMEN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING 3 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT PUBLIC HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST THE BENEFICIAL CLASS 4 TO ADVANCE THE MENTAL AND MORAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF BOYS AND YOUNG MEN, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE FROM THE BENEFICIAL CLASS AND EX-OFFENDERS, THOSE AFFECTED BY DRUGS OR THOSE EXPERIENCING ECONOMIC OR SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE 5 TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THOSE FROM ETHNIC MINORITY BACKGROUNDS, THROUGH PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS 6 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS IN SOCIETY, SO THAT THE 'BENEFICIAL CLASS' ARE ABLE TO REALISE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL, HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Square Root Business Centre
102-116 Windmill Road
CROYDON
CR0 2XQ
- Phone:
- 0800 073 1325
- Email:
- mightymenofvalour@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window