FRIENDS OF BWINDI HOSPITAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise money for the benefit of Bwindi Community Hospital in Kanungu District in Uganda
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- City Of London
- Lewisham
- Uganda
Governance
- 21 November 2008: Standard registration
- 04 December 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FBCHC (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF BWINDI COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTRE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.68k | £15.97k | £36.68k | £16.87k | £733 | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.28k | £15.26k | £43.15k | £20.31k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 13 August 2018 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 30 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 26 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | 03 June 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/12/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROMOTE THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PEOPLE OF KANUNGU DISTRICT IN UGANDA BY RAISING FUNDS FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE BWINDI COMMUNITY HEALTH CENTRE WITH A VIEW TO REDUCE CHILD MORTALITY, IMPROVE MATERNAL HEALTH, COMBAT HIV/AIDS, MALARIA AND OTHER DISEASES AND IMPROVE THE PROVISION OF CLEAN WATER AND SANITATION.
Area of benefit
UGANDA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window