FRIENDS OF NORTH RIDGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for current priorities: accessible minibus, multi sensory environment. Provision of summer, easter and february playscheme for our most vulnerable and complex students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 24 November 2008: Standard registration
- 24 April 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- NORTH RIDGE SPECIALIST SCHOOLS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT NORTH RIDGE HIGH BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES ( NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITY ) FOR EDUCATION AT SCHOOL. TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY; ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.UK AND INTERNATIONALLY; AND 3.1.3 ENGAGING IN RELIEF PROJECTS TO ASSIST THOSE IN POVERTY, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS IN THE UK AND INTERNATIONALLY. 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NORTH RIDGE HIGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window