Trustees FAMILIES IN TELFORD

Charity number: 1130708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Johns Chair 08 March 2018
None on record
Patricia Jayne Stevens Trustee 22 August 2024
None on record
Kathryn Anne Dennison Trustee 30 November 2022
None on record
Rev Dawn Taffinder Trustee 30 November 2022
MADELEY UNITED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY OF WILLIAM JOHN LEGGE
Received: On time
Joanne Warburton Trustee 06 November 2019
FRIENDS OF WOODLANDS PTA
Received: On time
DOCTOR RAJA BANDAK Trustee 09 March 2018
None on record