QPR IN THE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
QPR in the Community Trust provides opportunities in 7 West London boroughs based on the objectives of Health, Education, Social Inclusion & Participation, tackling National issues at a local level.The Trust recognises the power that football/the football Club has, reaching around 25,000 participants yearly aged 2-90, breaking down barriers to participation & creating safer, positive communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £21,600 from 1 government contract(s) and £137,142 from 2 government grant(s)
People

93 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Brent
- City Of Westminster
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Kensington And Chelsea
Governance
- 30 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruben Emir Gnanalingam | Chair | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roy Ledgister | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Smith | Trustee | 25 February 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Sinton | Trustee | 14 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA KENNEDY | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Mohammed Khaliel | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charles Lee Hoos | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN MCGRATH | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65m | £1.51m | £2.15m | £2.78m | £2.69m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.61m | £1.50m | £2.05m | £2.48m | £2.76m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.91k | £21.60k | |
|
Income from government grants | £78.55k | £26.66k | £31.61k | £25.98k | £137.14k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £872.34k | £920.81k | £862.99k | £1.23m | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £778.12k | £588.65k | £1.29m | £1.55m | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.61m | £1.50m | £2.05m | £2.48m | £2.76m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £16.57k | £19.26k | £18.82k | £19.10k | £13.24k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.89k | £10.49k | £44.67k | £44.37k | £40.98k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £1.22m | £1.40m | £1.42m | £1.39m | £1.63m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £632.13k | £802.30k | £764.20k | £431.47k | £727.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 10 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 11 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 SEP 2018 as amended on 30 May 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS) AND OVERSEAS AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: 1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF CHARITY; AND 4 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS HE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
LOFTUS ROAD STADIUM
SOUTH AFRICA ROAD
LONDON
W12 7PJ
- Phone:
- 02087402509
- Email:
- andye@qpr.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window