SEEDS OF PEACE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We inspire and cultivate new generations of global leaders in communities divided by conflict. We equip them with the skills and relationships they need to accelerate changes essential to peace. Seeds of Peace UK promotes awareness through events, develops our alumni network, provides educational programming for schools, and generates support and funding for our mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 24 September 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faiza Habeeb Seth | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eva Armour | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lani Christine Martin | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saloni Thakrar | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.56k | £8.04k | £6.71k | £21.09k | £1.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.17k | £44.80k | £25.12k | £9.44k | £34.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2024 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 December 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 December 2021 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
3.1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE FROM REGIONS OF CONFLICT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY PROMOTING METHODS OF RESOLVING CONFLICT AND PROMOTING RACIAL HARMONY, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY THE PROVISION OF CAMPS AND ONGOING PROGRAMS WHERE SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE CAN COME TOGETHER IN AN EFFORT TO PROMOTE PEACE AND CO-EXISTENCE; 3.2. TO EDUCATE AND EMPOWER SUCH YOUNG LEADERS BY EQUIPPING THEM WITH THE LEADERSHIP, COMMUNICATION AND NEGOTIATION SKILLS REQUIRED TO ADVANCE RECONCILIATION.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Atlantic House
Bell Lane
Bellbrook Industrial Estate
UCKFIELD
East Sussex
TN22 1QL
- Phone:
- +12125738040
- Email:
- info@seedsofpeace.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window