Financial history IVCC

Charity Number: 1128437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £38.58m £39.44m £48.61m £33.44m £20.35m
Total expenditure £37.08m £38.21m £47.47m £32.33m £20.19m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £5.24m £6.07m
Income from government grants £8.80m £8.19m £5.94m N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £37.34m £39.21m £48.48m £33.05m £19.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £558.00k £226.00k £129.00k £383.00k £725.00k
Income - Other £678.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £37.08m £38.21m £47.47m £32.33m £20.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0