WHITWELL AND REEPHAM RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charitable company's objectives and activities are:- The preservation and conservation for the benefit of the public of the historic Whitwell Station, Norfolk and its surroundings, its structures, associated rolling stock and history. To advance the education of the public in the history and development of Whitwell Station, Norfolk and its surroundings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 05 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL FREDERICK URRY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Robert Ewles | Trustee | 08 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Bailey | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAWN URRY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.85k | £112.64k | £66.31k | £60.83k | £49.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.09k | £77.33k | £55.39k | £46.15k | £62.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 2 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
I. THE PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE HISTORIC WHITWELL STATION, NORFOLK AND ITS SURROUNDINGS, ITS STRUCTURES, ASSOCIATED ROLLING STOCK AND HISTORY. II. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE HISTORIC WHITWELL STATION, NORFOLK AND ITS SURROUNDINGS.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Whitwell & Reepham Station
Whitwell Road
Reepham
NORWICH
NR10 4GA
- Phone:
- 01603871694
- Email:
- whitwellinfo@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window