WAKEFIELD AND DISTRICT HEALTHY HEARTS SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wakefield & District Healthy Hearts support group provides support to those who have been touched by cardiac illness. Providing emotional, practical & financial help & assistance for patients, families, friends & carers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 05 November 2008: Standard registration
- 08 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.13k | £10.39k | £4.44k | £1.80k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.22k | £10.88k | £7.58k | £485 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 03 July 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 04 August 2015 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 19 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN THE WAKEFIELD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED OR ARE EXPERIENCING HEART DISEASE, AND THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, EDUCATION, AND PRACTICAL ADVICE, (B) TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH OF SAID PERSONS; (C) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO HEART DISEASE.
Area of benefit
WAKEFIELD METROPOLITAN DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window