PRO ACTION HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An independent charity operating as an infrastructure & support organisation to other organisations working with young people in Herts. Affiliated organisations, clubs and projects work directly with over 40,000 young people on a regular basis. Pro-Action works in partnership with the statutory and private sector to bring direct benefit to young people and voluntary youth organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £50,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 14 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIOBHAN ELIZABETH PURVIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Louise Topping | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bernard William Flanagan | Trustee | 25 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.93k | £98.85k | £88.50k | £75.15k | £76.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £310.41k | £90.33k | £89.68k | £88.78k | £92.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £54.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.00k | £24.21k | £50.00k | £50.00k | £50.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE BETWEEN THE AGES OF 11 AND 19 LIVING IN OR NEAR HERTFORDSHIRE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE ON EDUCATIONAL, EMPLOYMENT, LEISURE AND OTHER OPPORTUNITIES AND ORGANISING TRAINING IN YOUTH WORK AND OTHER SKILLS AS A MEANS OF :- A) HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION; AND C) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
HERTFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
LONGMORES
24 CASTLE STREET
HERTFORD
SG14 1HP
- Phone:
- 01707276859
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window