Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - RCCG MY FATHERS HOUSE SALFORD

Charity number: 1126655
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £316.01k £333.01k £402.12k £454.14k £627.05k
Total expenditure £266.78k £256.02k £343.63k £392.93k £409.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.79k £49.24k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £627.05k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £409.24k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0