THE FOUNDATION FOR INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY ASSISTANCE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FINCA UK's mission is the relief of poverty through lasting solutions that help people build assets, create jobs and raise their standard of living.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Afghanistan
- Armenia
- Azerbaijan
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Ecuador
- Georgia
- Guatemala
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Jordan
- Kosovo
- Kyrgyzstan
- Malawi
- Nicaragua
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
Governance
- 29 January 2009: Standard registration
- FINCA UK (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colleen Rose Zakrewsky | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Bruce McGillivray | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Peacock | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alex Yew | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Herma Majoor | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Emil Stumpff | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Soeren Fryland Moeller | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Greenaway | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pedro Miguel Weiss | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dane Steven McGuire | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.32k | £249.58k | £254.85k | £447.91k | £302.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.16k | £158.85k | £309.47k | £342.94k | £365.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE: 3.1 THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS, 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF GLOBAL HEALTH AND NUTRITION, 3.3 THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION, AND 3.4 THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, IN EACH CASE THROUGH THE CREATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF LASTING SOLUTIONS TO INTRACTABLE SOCIAL PROBLEMS IMPACTING THE LIVES OF LOW INCOME INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES, AND THE COMMUNITIES IN WHICH THEY LIVE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lynton House
7-12 Tavistock Square
London
UK
WC1H 9LT
- Phone:
- 07595332289
- Email:
- info@fincauk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window