Financial history SAFETY FIRST COMMUNITY TRAINING CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1128555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £111.01k £111.42k £116.86k £186.30k £264.94k
Total expenditure £77.94k £97.48k £137.54k £185.02k £238.61k
Income from government contracts £7.44k N/A N/A N/A £99.35k
Income from government grants N/A £55.46k £10.21k N/A £23.84k