NEIL DESAI FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of young people by provision of prizes, awards and grants; To advance the physical education of young people, and in particular but not exclusively in the sports of cricket and squash, by provision of awards and grants;The relief of poverty and those in need in Africa and India; To promote awareness and invest in prevention of cardiac risk in young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- WWW.NEILDESAI.CO.UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £5.03k | £13.80k | £1.16k | £406 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.01k | £6.53k | £3.03k | £7.08k | £8.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 19 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 29 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ADOPTED ON 20 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE BY THE PROVISION OF PRIZES, AWARDS AND GRANTS; 2) TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE SPORTS OF CRICKET AND SQUASH, BY THE PROVISION OF AWARDS AND GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH OR DISABILITY IN AFRICA AND INDIA; 4) TO PROMOTE AWARENESS AND INVEST IN PREVENTION OF CARDIAC RISK IN YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL, AFRICA AND INDIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window