NEIGHBOURLY CARE IN HASSOCKS, BURGESS HILL AND DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide assistance to those in need of help in their day to day activities i.e. a good neighbour service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY WILLIAM VANDER-WILLIGEN | Chair | 21 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE NEWTON | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nazeema Dhansay | Trustee | 08 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Griffiths | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mary Grover | Trustee | 20 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.88k | £4.70k | £1.92k | £2.64k | £3.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.18k | £3.48k | £3.51k | £3.47k | £2.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 31 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH NEIGHBOURLY CARE IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN WEST SUSSEX IN PARTICULAR HASSOCKS AND BURGESS HILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO ARE IN NEED OF HELP BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH VOLUNTARY CARING WORK AS MAY BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
WEST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o centre management centre
Market Place
Shopping Centre
Burgess Hill
RH15 9NP
- Phone:
- 07876066368
- Email:
- ncarehassocks@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window