CARIBBEAN SPORTS CLUB (SHEFFIELD) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
sports from any field
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 29 December 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
des smith | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet angel | Trustee | 21 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
MILTON ROY SAMUEL MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL ALPHONZO GITTENS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.91k | £23.39k | £61.10k | £44.52k | £52.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.64k | £17.62k | £48.86k | £28.78k | £43.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £6.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 December 2024 | 313 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 October 2024 | 630 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2022 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 AUGUST 2007 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL WRITTEN RESOLUTION ON THE 1 DECEMBER 2008/
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHEFFIELD AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE INHABITANTS OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN ORIGIN OR DESCENT BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING AMATEUR SPORTS WHICH ARE CAPABLE OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL HEALTH; 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY THOSE PERSONS OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN ORIGIN OR DESCENT AND LIVING IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICTS (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AMATEUR SPORTS AND OTHER RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH EDUCATION AND A HEALTHY LIFESTYLE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARIBBEAN SPORTS CLUB
THE COMMON
ECCLESFIELD
SHEFFIELD
S35 9WL
- Phone:
- 0114 2463710
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window