Financial history THE PANKHURST TRUST (INCORPORATING MANCHESTER WOMEN'S AID)

Charity number: 1126433
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.96m £2.57m £3.02m £3.59m £3.58m
Total expenditure £2.02m £2.43m £3.08m £3.52m £3.75m
Income from government contracts £668.51k £675.25k £607.22k £1.34m £1.38m
Income from government grants N/A £187.39k £788.89k £725.25k £1.08m
Income - Donations and legacies £88.33k £137.03k £127.47k £92.62k £112.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £6.28k £19.23k £51.11k £56.43k
Income - Charitable activities £1.86m £2.43m £2.87m £3.44m £3.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £2.95k £5.06k £424 £6.67k
Income - Other £9.45k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.01m £2.43m £3.08m £3.51m £3.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £9.01k £200 £2.25k £6.15k £6.94k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £7.96k £238.82k £289.30k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0