HEBDEN BRIDGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hebden Bridge Community Association is the development trust for Hebden Bridge and neighboring communities. Its main function is to manage and operate Hebden Bridge Town Hall as a community hub and focal point of community and civic life, following the asset transfer of the building from Calderdale Council in 2010.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £111,981 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Calderdale
Governance
- 19 January 2009: Standard registration
- 17 April 2025: Funds received from 1201078 THREADBEAR THEATRE CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Inglis Scott | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sue Barlow | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Christopher Guy | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Blackwell | Trustee | 26 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Swindlehurst | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Gardner | Trustee | 10 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.33m | £314.12k | £430.74k | £529.32k | £462.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £374.85k | £296.14k | £406.47k | £463.18k | £413.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.24k | £26.94k | £27.67k | £29.38k | £111.98k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.10m | N/A | N/A | £3.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £231.34k | N/A | N/A | £525.79k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £498 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £374.45k | N/A | N/A | £463.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £400 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £31.96k | N/A | N/A | £27.40k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2012
Charitable objects
A) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF HEBDEN BRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. B) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION AND IN PARTICULAR IN HEBDON BRIDGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (A) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS OR (B) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 2) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS. 3) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES. 4) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE. 5) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. C) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC SUCH OTHER PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Town Hall
St. Georges Street
Hebden Bridge
HX7 7BY
- Phone:
- 01422417300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window