THE HIVE AVON LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help people with a learning disability by the provision of help and support for them and for their families, dependants and carers. To provide or assist in the provision of facilities for the recreation or other leisure time occupation for people who have a need thereof by reason of a learning disability with the object of improving their conditions of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £25,215 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
66 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 10 November 2008: Standard registration
- AVON NORTH MENCAP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Barker-Lee | Chair | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adam Thomas Brittain | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martha Rosie Green | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Loftus | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anthony Hick | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER ANTHONY READ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.75k | £130.14k | £133.48k | £121.35k | £142.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.05k | £105.27k | £101.68k | £129.82k | £147.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | £25.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 SEPTEMBER 2008 as amended on 08 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
3.1 THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS. 3.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. "LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL CITY AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Hive Avon
322-324 Two Mile Hill Road
Two Mile Hill Road
Kingswood
Bristol
BS15 1AJ
- Phone:
- 01179614372
- Email:
- office@thehiveavon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window