WEST WIGHT NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Children's day Nursery & Creche
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
Total income includes £166,081 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 19 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HOWE | Chair |
|
||||||
Mary Catherine Millard | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Katie Penstone-Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lester John Brett-Hill | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA DAWN RICHARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.19k | £231.11k | £236.33k | £322.59k | £335.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.32k | £215.04k | £239.25k | £312.85k | £336.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £114.83k | £156.38k | £135.28k | £141.92k | £166.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 20 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO PROVIDE NURSERY CARE AND EDUCATION FOR BABIES AND PRE-SCHOOL INFANTS AND TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE CLASSES, LECTURES, FACILITIES, SERVICES AND RESOURCES FOR EDUCATING AND FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS OF ALL AGES AND ABILITIES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WEST WIGHT NURSERY
SUMMERS LANE
TOTLAND BAY
PO39 0HQ
- Phone:
- 01983640190
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window