ELYONS HEART FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The EHF is supporting The Fetal Heart Dept in their process of joining the study and will be applying for Ethical approval very soon. This will enable them to become the FIRST CENTRE in the UK, that will use the ?Angel Sounds Monitor? for the St George's pregnant ladies who are monitored for heart block as they have anti-Ro and anti-LA antibodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Luton
- Milton Keynes
- Throughout London
- Jamaica
Governance
- 12 December 2008: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 January 2013: Re-registered
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400 | £1.50k | £208 | £738 | £650 | |
|
Total expenditure | £277 | £1.24k | £150 | £607 | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 01 June 2018 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 June 2017 | 147 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CONGENITAL HEART DISEASE AND ALLIED CONDITIONS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE SUPPORT OF THE FAMILIES AND CARERS OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, THROUGHOUT LONDON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window