THE VERNON MINE WARFARE AND DIVING MONUMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ON 17TH MARCH 2020 THE CHARITY ACHIEVED ITS MAIN AIM BY INSTALLING THE MONUMENT TO THE HERITAGE OF HMS VERNON, IN PARTICULAR THE MINE WARFARE AND DIVING COMMUNITIES PAST, PRESENT AND FUTURE. THE MONUMENT IS LOCATED IN GUNWHARF QUAYS, PORTSMOUTH, HAMPSHIRE, UK. THE ONGOING CAMPAIGN LED BY THE TRUSTEES WILL CONTINUE TO RAISE FUNDS IN ORDER TO ENSURE THE LONG LIFE AND WELL-BEING OF THE MONUMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 March 2009: Standard registration
- The Vernon Monument Charity (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt John Steven Ravenhall MID, QCVS | Chair | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Commander Martin Mackey RN | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Joseph Lewis Anderson | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lt Cdr David Robert Stanbury | Trustee | 24 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Thomas Coulter | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
John James Turnbull | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
CDR David Braddock SANDIFORD RN | Trustee | 02 July 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.65k | £15.58k | £19.17k | £5.18k | £4.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.68k | £5.16k | £41.23k | £4.87k | £7.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST OF 21 JANUARY 2009 as amended on 16 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
(1) TO FOSTER PATRIOTISM AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT AND EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE CITIZENS AND VISITORS TO THE CITY OF PORTSMOUTH ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A MONUMENT AT GUNWHARF QUAYS OR OTHER PROMINENT PLACE WITHIN THE CITY CENTRE OF PORTSMOUTH AS A PERMANENT MEMORIAL TO THE PATRIOTISM AND BRAVERY OF THE ROYAL NAVY AND ROYAL MARINES MINE WARFARE AND DIVING SPECIALISTS AND ASSOCIATED COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO WERE TRAINED AND BASED IN HMS VERNON. (2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS INCOME IS NOT SPENT IN ANY ONE YEAR, IT MAY BE APPLIED, AT THE TRUSTEES' DISCRETION, TO ANY OTHER CHARITABLE TRUST CONNECTED WITH THE ROYAL NAVY OR ROYAL MARINES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
PORTSMOUTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 St. Helens Close
SOUTHSEA
PO4 0NN
- Phone:
- 07967810242
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window