ELDON COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide Cafe facilities Wednesday and Friday. 4 to 11years Childrens drop in club Tuesday 4.30 to 5.30pm. Bingo Wednesday 7.30 to 9.30pm. Thursday Health visitor 1.30-2.30pm Friday, Saturday and Sunday open for Social Events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 08 April 2024
Total income includes £6,684 from 9 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Durham
Governance
- 05 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TONI WALLACE | Trustee | 24 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GIBSON COUNCILLOR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANE PENNINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 08/04/2020 | 08/04/2021 | 08/04/2022 | 08/04/2023 | 08/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108 | £22.00k | £22.92k | £6.32k | £12.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.84k | £5.55k | £6.19k | £4.98k | £15.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.60k | N/A | N/A | £6.68k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 April 2020 | 11 May 2021 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JANUARY 2007 AS AMENDED 08 APRIL 2008 AND 27 JULY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ELDON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
ELDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 ELDON BANK
ELDON
BISHOP AUCKLAND
DL14 8DX
- Phone:
- 01388773309
- Email:
- 01388773309@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window