THE CHALE HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Chale Summer Show, Horticultural Marquee entries. Competition for annual Trophies. Regular Meetings of the Horticultural Society. Autumn Show. Seed Purchase Scheme and Advice from Judges. Educational visits ( Local Schools Project).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 20 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BERNARD HARDY | Chair |
|
||||||
Alan Lock | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW J WOODFORD | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE RICHARD ELDRIDGE | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN SHEILA ELDRIDGE | Trustee | 04 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JAMES DAVID FOTHERGILL | Trustee | 27 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR ANDY IRVING | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.71k | £6.08k | £5 | £19.75k | £44.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.11k | £8.46k | £8.07k | £22.05k | £27.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 February 2025 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 February 2025 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 February 2025 | 471 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 January 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1 THE PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF HORTICULTURAL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHALE, ISLE OF WIGHT, BY THE HOLDING OF ANNUAL SHOWS, COMPETITIONS MEETINGS AND LECTURES. 2 THE PROVISION OF SUCH GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR INDIVIDUALS OR SUCH CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
CHALE, ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 NEW COTTAGES
CHALE GREEN
VENTNOR
PO38 2JL
- Phone:
- 01983551014
- Email:
- secretary@thechaleshow.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window