ARTS GATEWAY MK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting and Promoting The Arts and Creative Growth in Milton Keynes. To promote the arts in and around Milton Keynes by way of our Arts Central Creative Hub, MK Literary Festival, Networking Events, Social Networking and regular Newsletters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 24 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BEST | Chair |
|
||||||
Junita Fernandaz | Trustee | 25 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Moira North | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Raven | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Palmira Teresa Do Carmo Almeida M De Sousa Matoso | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.47k | £151.69k | £123.85k | £146.41k | £186.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.42k | £96.11k | £134.13k | £151.04k | £195.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £18.32k | N/A | N/A | £20.00k | £35.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED 11 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO FOSTER AND DEVELOP THE ARTS IN THE UNITARY COUNCIL AREA OF MILTON KEYNES ( HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT )
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Arts Gateway MK
20 Burners Lane
Kiln Farm
MILTON KEYNES
MK11 3HB
- Phone:
- 01908635903
- Email:
- info@artsgatewaymk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window