Accounts and annual returns MACCLESFIELD AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE 332

Charity number: 1126597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2024 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 February 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 March 2022 32 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late Download Open in new window