Financial history ST ANDREWS DOCK HERITAGE PARK ACTION GROUP

Charity number: 1128457
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.02k £1.81k £103.29k £25.32k £4.80k
Total expenditure £1.90k £525 £1.15k £780 £9.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £1.50k N/A N/A