Governing document ST ANDREWS DOCK HERITAGE PARK ACTION GROUP

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED 17 MAY 2010 as amended on 27 Jul 2022 as amended on 13 May 2024 as amended on 30 Apr 2025 as amended on 30 Apr 2025
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL, BUT SCHOOL CHILDREN IN PARTICULAR, IN THE ROLE THAT HULL'S FISHING INDUSTRY AND COMMUNITIES PLAY IN THE MARITIME LIFE AND HISTORY OF THE CITY OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, BY THE PRESERVATION AND MAINTENANCE OF MARITIME ARTICLES, OBJECTS AND ARTEFACTS WHICH HAVE PARTICULAR RELEVANCE TO THE FISHING INDUSTRY.
Area of benefit
HULL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.