PANTYGWYDR BAPTIST CHURCH SWANSEA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Public services of Christian worship on Sundays at 9.15am and 11.00am .Other service times see the church website.The church runs housegroups in various homes. Children's work includes Sunday Club ,Tiny Tots,Brownies and other activities run by volunteers. Youthwork is coordinated by a paid Youth Pastor assisted by volunteers. We also hold a Renew Wellbeing Cafe open to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 06 November 2008: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard John Jeacock | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Edwin Ingram | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kingsley Imevbore Ofeimu | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Thomas Tippin | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Morag Elizabeth Eddyshaw | Trustee | 21 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Ingram | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Helen Doody | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Matthew Ian Carter | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £179.16k | £132.20k | £161.54k | £203.35k | £166.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.64k | £140.24k | £171.50k | £210.84k | £172.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 February 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
GLOBAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PANTYGWYDR BAPTIST CHURCH
ERNALD PLACE
UPLANDS
SWANSEA
SA2 0HN
- Phone:
- 01792 459144
- Email:
- office@pantygwydr.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window