Accounts and annual returns WICKHAM MARKET YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity number: 1126594

Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 12 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Annual return | 12 June 2023 | 13 August 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2023 | 29 August 2024 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 12 June 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 12 June 2022 | 16 May 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 March 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 March 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window