Financial history WICKHAM MARKET YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity Number: 1126594
Charity reporting is up to date (41 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 12/06/2022 12/06/2023 12/06/2024
Total gross income £21.38k £13.22k £29.79k £33.74k £35.58k
Total expenditure £15.18k £10.34k £26.07k £27.81k £40.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.44k