INTERNATIONAL NATIONAL TRUSTS ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
INTO is a network of National Trusts and similar non governmental organisations, globally diverse but united by a shared commitment to conserving and sustaining our shared heritage - built and natural, tangible and intangible. Our charitable objective is to 'promote the conservation and enhancement of the heritage of all nations for the benefit of the people of the world and future generations'.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Australia
- Belgium
- Bermuda
- Canada
- Cayman Islands
- China
- Czech Republic
- Falkland Islands
- Fiji
- France
- Gibraltar
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Jersey
- Malaysia
- Malta
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Portugal
- Russia
- Saint Helena
- Scotland
- Slovakia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- St Lucia
- Taiwan
- Thailand
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Uganda
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 24 February 2009: Standard registration
- 22 March 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 22 March 2019: Funds transferred to 1175994 INTERNATIONAL NATIONAL TRUSTS ORGANISATION
- INTO (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.59k | £37.55k | £61.84k | £54.01k | £120.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.77k | £29.45k | £52.22k | £39.31k | £88.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 15 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 15 June 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 30 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 30 August 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 19 September 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 FEBRUARY 2009 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTIONS DATED 03 JULY 2009 AND 22 DECEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE CULTURAL HERITAGE OF ALL NATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window