ONESKY FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OneSky creates affordable, replicable early childhood intervention models, teaching communities to provide nurturing responsive care and early childhood education to at-risk children. OneSky was originally created to help children in China?s orphanages, then expanded to left-behind children in villages in 2015, later in 2017, we opened an ELC serving children of factory workers in Vietnam.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- China
- Vietnam
Governance
- 15 January 2009: Standard registration
- HALF THE SKY FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JENNY BOWEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY SCOTT HUXLEY | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER RUPERT LIGHTE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZHANG ZHIRONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.30k | £43.32k | £6.47k | £6.47k | £5.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.72k | £28.11k | £9.26k | £9.26k | £1.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE: THE AIDING OF AT-RISK CHILDREN WORLDWIDE BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL SUPPORT, ASSETS AND RESOURCES (INCLUDING BUILDINGS AND PEOPLE), EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER MATERIALS, TRAINING, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS, COMMUNITIES, ORGANISATIONS AND GOVERNMENTS FOR THE CREATION OF (I) EARLY CHILDHOOD CARING, NURTURE AND EDUCATION PROGRAMS; (II) INDIVIDUALISED LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES FOR OLDER CHILDREN; AND (III) PARENTING SKILLS AND RESPONSIVE CARE EDUCATION FOR FAMILY MEMBERS, TEACHERS AND CAREGIVERS.
Area of benefit
CHINA
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O JORDANS LIMITED, SUITE 1
3RD FLOOR
11-12 ST. JAMES S SQUARE
11 St. James's Square
LONDON
SW1Y 4LB
- Phone:
- 85225205266
- Email:
- contact@onesky.org
- Website:
-
onesky.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window