THE COWPAT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Tanzania
Governance
- 24 February 2009: Standard registration
- 14 July 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 14 July 2023: Funds transferred to 234714 STEWARDSHIP SERVICES (UKET) LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.24k | £192 | £34.69k | £8.68k | £8.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.13k | £34.70k | £38.63k | £16.64k | £16.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 March 2021 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 27 July 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY MAKING AND/OR GIVING DONATIONS, GRANTS, LOANS, GUARANTEES AND/OR INVESTMENTS FROM TIME TO TIME OUT OF SOME OR ALL OF THE INCOME AND/OR CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window